Name | Period |
---|---|
Shri Rajeshwar Bhutalia | 01.04.2004 – 31.03.2007 |
Shri Abhay Deshmukh | 01.04.2007 – 31.03.2008 |
Shri Sanjeev Vasudev | 01.04.2008 – 31.03.2009 |
Shri Mahesh Yadav | 01.04.2009 – 28.02.2010 |
Dr. Shamsher Singh Yadav | 01.04.2010 -28.02.2011 |
Shri Jeet Ram Sharma | 01.04.2011 – 28.02.2014 |
Dr. Shamsher Singh Yadav | 01.04.2014 – 10.04.2016 |
Adv. Bhagat Singh Yadav | 04.05.2016 – 28.02.2018 |
Shri Ramesh Bhardwaj | 06.03.2019 – 13.09.2019 |
Adv. Rajesh Khatana | 14.09.2019 – 31.03.2021 |
Adv. Rajesh Khatana | 01.04.2021 - |